Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7778
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7778
Title:Gerald Scott, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-163)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 17, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2021 to June 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 16, 2021.
May 17 2021Brief amici curiae of FAMM and The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2021 to July 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 16, 2021.
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2021 to August 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2021.
Aug 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2021 to September 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 15, 2021.
Sep 15 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew B. Larsen
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of New York
52 Duane Street
New York, NY 10007

Matthew_Larsen@fd.org
(212) 417-8725
Party name: Gerald Scott
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: FAMM and The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543