Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7763
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7763
Title:Brian David Hill, Petitioner
v.
Virginia
Docketed:April 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(200267)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 5, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 17, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Jun 02 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian David Hill310 Forest Street
Apt. 2
Martinsville, VA 24112

276-790-3505
Party name: Brian David Hill

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543