Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-769
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-769
Title:GS Cleantech Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Adkins Energy LLC, et al.
Docketed:December 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2231, 2017-1838)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Waiver of right of respondent Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Waiver of right of respondent Iroquois Bio-Energy Company, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Waiver of right of respondents ICM, Inc, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Waiver of right of respondent Blue Flint Ethanol LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2020Waiver of right of respondent Bushmills Ethanol, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2020Waiver of right of respondent GEA Mechanical Equipment US, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2020Waiver of right of respondent Adkins Energy LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 11 2020Waiver of right of respondent Lincolnway Energy, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 11 2020Waiver of right of respondents Homeland Energy Solutions, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 16 2020Waiver of right of respondent Aemetis Advanced Fuels Keyes, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Michael Edward McCabe, Jr. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence M. Hadley
    Counsel of Record
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
10250 Constellation Blvd.
19th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

lhadley@glaserweil.com
3105533000
Party name: GS Cleantech Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc Andre Al
    Counsel of Record
Stoel Rivers LLP
33 South Sixth Street
Suite 4200
Minneapolis, MN 55402

marc.al@stoel.com
(612) 373-8801
Party name: Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC
Spiro Bereveskos
    Counsel of Record
Woodard, Emhardt, Henry, Reeves & Wagner, LLP
111 Monument Circle
Suite 3700
Indianapolis, IN 46204

judy@uspatent.com
(317) 634-3456
Party name: Iroquois Bio-Energy Company, LLC
Michael F. Buchanan
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americans
New York, NY 10036

mfbuchanan@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: GEA Mechanical Equipment US, Inc., et al.
Michael Ambrose Dee
    Counsel of Record
BrownWinick Law Firm
666 Grand Ave
Ste 2000
Des Moines, IA 50309-2510

michael.dee@brownwinick.com
5152422400
Party name: Aemetis, Inc.
Michael Ambrose Dee
    Counsel of Record
BrownWinick Law Firm
666 Grand Ave
Ste 2000
Des Moines, IA 50309-2510

michael.dee@brownwinick.com
5152422400
Party name: Pacific Ethanol, Inc.
Michael Ambrose Dee
    Counsel of Record
BrownWinick PLC
666 Grand Ave
Ste 2000
Des Moines, IA 50309-2510

michael.dee@brownwinick.com
5152422400
Party name: Homeland Energy Solutions, LLC
Michael Ambrose Dee
    Counsel of Record
BrownWinick Law Firm
666 Grand Ave
Ste 2000
Des Moines, IA 50309

michael.dee@brownwinick.com
5152422400
Party name: Pacific Ethanol Stockton, LLC
Michael Ambrose Dee
    Counsel of Record
BrownWinick Law Firm
666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000
Des Moines, IA 50309

michael.dee@brownwinick.com
5152422475
Party name: Aemetis Advanced Fuels Keyes, Inc.
Glenn L. Johnson
    Counsel of Record
McKee, Voorhees & Sease, P.L.C.
801 Grand Ave.
Suite 3200
Des Moines, IA 50309

glenn.johnson@ipmvs.com
515-288-3667
Party name: Lincolnway Energy, LLC
Keith D. Parr
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
111 S. Wacker Dr.
Chicago, IL 60606

kparr@lockelord.com
312-443-0497
Party name: Adkins Energy LLC
John C. Scheller
    Counsel of Record
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
One South Pinckney Street
Suite 700
Madison, WI 53703

jcscheller@michaelbest.com
(608) 257-3501
Party name: Bushmills Ethanol, Inc., et al.
Ruth RivardStinson LLP
50 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

ruth.rivard@stinson.com
612-335-1799
Party name: Blue Flint Ethanol LLC
John M. WeyrauchDicke, Billing & Czaja, PLLC
100 S. 5th St., Suite 2250
Menneapolis, MN 55402

jmweyrauch@dbclaw.com
612-573-2000
Party name: ICM, Inc, et al.
Other
Michael Edward McCabe Jr.
    Counsel of Record
McCabe & Ali LLP
9233 Fall River Lane
Potomac, MD 20854

mike@mccabeali.com
3017981110
Party name: Michael Edward McCabe, Jr.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543