Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7617
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7617
Title:Willie Lee Lewis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15076)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 30, 2021 to May 31, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Jun 01 2021Memorandum for the United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2022.
Apr 04 2022Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Wooden v. United States, 595 U. S. ___ (2022).
May 06 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Francis Daly
    Counsel of Record
Daniel F. Daly, Esq.
P.O. Box 357100
Gainesville, FL 32635-7100

danfrandaly@gmail.com
3522758963
Party name: Willie Lee Lewis
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543