Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7559
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7559
Title:Lora Kay Oxendine-Taylor, Petitioner
v.
Eastern Band of Cherokee Indians, Council
Docketed:March 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2011)
   Decision Date:November 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 26, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021Petition DENIED.
Jun 16 2021Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Jul 29 2021DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 23 2021Rehearing DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lora K. Oxendine-Taylor7568 N. US 421 Hwy.
Clinton, NC 28328

828-260-7862
Party name: Lora K. Oxendine-Taylor

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543