Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7553 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7553 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Len Davis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-70010)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 19, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 26, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2021 to May 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2021.
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 26, 2021 to June 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 25, 2021.
Jun 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2021 to July 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 23, 2021.
Jul 23 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 10 2021Reply of petitioner Len Davis filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543