Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-753
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-753
Title:Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Petitioner
v.
Yakima County, Washington, et al.
Docketed:December 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35199)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Yakima County, Washington, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 16 2020Response Requested. (Due January 15, 2021)
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2021 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 1, 2021.
Feb 26 2021Brief of respondents Yakima County, Washington, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 12 2021Reply of petitioner Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Apr 05 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ethan Andrew Jones
    Counsel of Record
Yakama Nation Office of Legal Counsel
P.O. Box 151, 401 Fort Road
Toppenish, WA, WA 98948

ethan@yakamanation-olc.org
5098348005
Party name: Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Attorneys for Respondents
Kirk Andrew Ehlis
    Counsel of Record
Menke Jackson Beyer, LLP
807 N. 39th Avenue
Yakima, WA 98902

kehlis@mjbe.com
5095750313
Party name: Yakima County, Washington, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543