Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7480 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7480 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Mickey Thomas, Petitioner
v.
Dexter Payne, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction
Docketed:March 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1833, 17-2380)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2021 to June 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 15, 2021.
Jun 15 2021Brief of respondent Dexter Payne in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Reply of petitioner Mickey Thomas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Charles Williams
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
1401 West Capitol, Suite 490
Little Rock, AR 72201

john_c_williams@fd.org
501.324.6132
Party name: Mickey Thomas
Attorneys for Respondent
Vincent Moore Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arkansas Attorney General
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

vincent.wagner@arkansasag.gov
(501) 682-8090
Party name: Dexter Payne
Nicholas Jacob BronniSolicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Dexter Payne

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543