Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7327
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7327
Title:Timothy A. Ward, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4720)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 29, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 5, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2021 to May 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 5, 2021.
May 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2021 to May 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 26, 2021.
May 26 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioner Timothy Ward filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caroline Swift Platt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1650 King Street, Suite 500
Alexandria, VA 22314

caroline_platt@fd.org
703-600-0810
Party name: Timothy Ward
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543