Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-72
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-72
Title:Janet L. Himsel, et al., Petitioners
v.
4/9 Livestock, LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 24, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(18A-PL-645)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 20, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2020 to August 31, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2020.
Aug 21 2020Brief amici curiae of Indiana Farmers Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2020Brief of Non-Governmental Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2020Brief of respondent State of Indiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 25 2020Reply of petitioners Janet Himsel, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Katherine Anne Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Animal Law and Policy Clinic
1607 Massachusetts Ave.,
Cambridge, MA 02138

kmeyer@law.harvard.edu
617-998-2450
Party name: Janet Himsel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Joseph Braun
    Counsel of Record
Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP
1346 North Delaware Street
Indianapolis, IN 46202

cbraun@psrb.com
3176370700
Party name: 4/9 Livestock, LLC, et al., Co-Alliance LLP, Sam Himsel, Cory Himsel and Clint Himsel
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana
Other
Jessica Leigh Culpepper
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L Street NW
Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

jculpepper@publicjustice.net
(202) 746-4958
Party name: Indiana Farmers Union, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543