Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7185 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7185 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:John Anthony Esposito, Petitioner
v.
Benjamin Ford, Warden
Docketed:February 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-11384)
   Decision Date:June 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 22, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 22, 2021 to March 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2021.
Mar 29 2021Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 07 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from April 15, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 13 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until May 19, 2021 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marcia A. Widder
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Resource Center
104 Marietta Street NW
Suite 260
Atlanta, GA 30303

marcy.widder@garesource.org
(404) 222-9202
Party name: John Esposito
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

sgraham@law.ga.gov
404-458-3239
Party name: Benjamin Ford

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543