Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-717
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-717
Title:Concerned Citizens for Nuclear Safety, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:November 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-9542)
   Decision Date:April 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion of respondent Triad National Security, LLC to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2020 to January 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2021, for all resondents.
Dec 22 2020Waiver of right of respondents United States Environmental Protection Agency, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 27 2021Brief of respondent Triad National Security, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2021Amended corporate disclosure statement regarding brief in opposition of Triad National Security, LLC filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 09 2021Reply of petitioner Concerned Citizens for Nuclear Safety, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lindsay Alexander Lovejoy Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lindsay A. Lovejoy, Jr.
3600 Cerrillos Road, #1001A
Santa Fe, NM 87505

lindsay@lindsaylovejoy.com
(505) 983-1800
Party name: Concerned Citizens for Nuclear Safety, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
James Taylor Banks
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

james.banks@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5802
Party name: Triad National Security, LLC
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Environmental Protection Agency, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543