Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7065 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7065 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Anibal Canales, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:February 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-70009)
   Decision Date:July 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 31, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 8, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2021 to April 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2021.
Mar 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Legal Academics filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2021Brief amici curiae of Arizona Capital Representation Project, et al. filed. (Corrected version submitted on 3/11/21)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 07 2021Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 21 2021Reply of petitioner Anibal Canales, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 10 2021Rescheduled.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 18 2021Rescheduled.
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 25 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 01 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 07 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 15 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph John Perkovich
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black, Inc.
PO Box 4544
New York, NY 10163

j.perkovich@phillipsblack.org
212 400 1660
Party name: Anibal Canales, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin
Matthew Hamilton FrederickOffice of the Attorney General of Texas
Deputy Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

matthew.frederick@oag.texas.gov
512.936.6407
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin
Other
Alexis Johara Hoag
    Counsel of Record
Columbia Law School
435 W 116th Street
Suite 605
New York, NY 10027

alexishoag@gmail.com
(203) 645-4918
Party name: Arizona Capital Representation Project, et al.
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Legal Academics

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543