Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7028
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7028
Title:Amos Mast, et al., Petitioners
v.
Fillmore County, Minnesota, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A19-1375)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 25, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 5, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisOtherOtherOtherPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Amos Mast, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent Minnesota Pollution Control Agency to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 05 2021Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and National Committee for Amish Religious Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 15 2021Response Requested. (Due April 14, 2021)
Apr 14 2021Brief of respondent Minnesota Pollution Control Agency in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Apr 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
Apr 28 2021Reply of petitioner Amos Mast, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOther
May 11 2021Rescheduled.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 18 2021Rescheduled.
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 24 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 01 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 08 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Fulton v. Philadelphia, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). Justice Alito, concurring in the judgment. (Detached Opinion) Justice Gorsuch, concurring in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand. (Detached Opinion)
Aug 03 2021MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 03 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Nelson Lipford
    Counsel of Record
Southern Minnesota Regional Legal Services
903 West Center Street, Suite 230
Rochester, MN 55902

brian.lipford@smrls.org
507-292-0080
Party name: Amos Mast, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
6517571010
Party name: Minnesota Pollution Control Agency
Christina BrownOffice of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street, Suite 900
St. Paul, MN 55101

christina.brown@ag.state.mn.us
651-757-1471
Party name: Minnesota Pollution Control Agency
Other
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and National Committee for Amish Religious Freedom

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543