Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-701 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-701 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Calvert, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:November 20, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(AP-77,063)
   Decision Date:October 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:June 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2020 to January 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 20, 2021.
Jan 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 20, 2021 to February 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 19, 2021.
Feb 19 2021Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2021Reply of petitioner James Calvert filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 19 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 29 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 12 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 21 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 27 2021Rescheduled.
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David W. DeBruin
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

DDeBruin@jenner.com
202-639-6015
Party name: James Calvert
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Wren Morris
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
300 W. 15th St.
Austin, TX 78701

jennifer.morris@oag.texas.gov
5129362991
Party name: Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543