Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-695
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-695
Title:Derek Piersing, Petitioner
v.
Domino’s Pizza Franchising LLC, et al.
Docketed:November 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2388)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2020Brief of respondents Domino’s Pizza Franchising LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor George A. Bermann filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2021Reply of petitioner Derek Piersing, on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 25 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Leah Marie Nicholls
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice, P.C.
1620 L Street, N.W.
Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

LNicholls@publicjustice.net
(202) 797-8600
Party name: Derek Piersing, on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated
Attorneys for Respondents
Courtney Gilligan Saleski
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP
1650 Market Street
Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19103

courtney.saleski@dlapiper.com
215-656-2431
Party name: Domino’s Pizza Franchising LLC, et al.
Other
Jack Samuel Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic, Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 06011

s-tenenbaum@law.northwestern.edu
3129537185
Party name: Professor George A. Bermann

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543