Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-66
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-66
Title:G&M Realty L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
Maria Castillo, et al.
Docketed:July 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-498-cv, 18-538-cv)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Waiver of right of respondent Maria Castillo, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: G&M Realty L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Rozynski
    Counsel of Record
Eisenberg & Baum, LLP
24 Union Square East, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10003

arozynski@eandblaw.com
2123538700
Party name: Maria Castillo, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543