Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-656
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-656
Title:Robert Kinghorn, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2101)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Petition DENIED.
Feb 05 2021Petition of Steven Schooley for rehearing not accepted for filing. (Paper filing not received - April 9, 2021)
Apr 22 2021Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
May 11 2021Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioners DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven Roger Schooley
    Counsel of Record
The Schooley Law Firm
108 Hillcrest Street
Orlando, FL 32801

sschooley@schooleylawfirm.com
407-377-6300
Party name: Steven Schooley
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
1700 New York Ave NW
Washington, DC 20006

wallj@sullcrom.com
(202) 956-7500
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543