Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-651
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-651
Title:Cook Children's Medical Center, Petitioner
v.
T. L., a Minor, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Second District
   Case Numbers:(02-20-00002-CV)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 16, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to December 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 21, 2020
Nov 24 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Cook Children's Medical Center
Blanket Consent
Dec 14 2020Brief amici curiae of Texas Alliance for Life, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Brief of respondents T.L., a Minor, and Mother, T.L., on her behalf in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2020Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioner Cook Children's Medical Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Cook Children's Medical Center
Attorneys for Respondents
Jillian Lee Schumacher
    Counsel of Record
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
6363 Woodway Drive, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77057

jillian@dtlawyers.com
713-917-0024
Party name: T.L., a Minor, and Mother, T.L., on her behalf
Other
Don Cruse
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Don Cruse
1108 Lavaca St.
Suite 110-436
Austin, TX 78701

don.cruse@texasappellate.com
512-853-9100
Party name: Texas Alliance for Life, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543