Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-6470
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-6470
Title:Frederick Demond Wilson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 1, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1949)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 15 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frederick Demond Wilson1304 Kinston St., Apt. D
New Bern, NC 28560

Party name: Frederick Demond Wilson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543