Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-645
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-645
Title:Standing Akimbo, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:November 12, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1049)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2021.
Jan 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2021 to February 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 12, 2021.
Feb 12 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Reply of petitioners Standing Akimbo, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Certificate of Compliance filed with respect to reply brief of petitioner Standing Akimbo, LLC, et al.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 18 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 25 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 31 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 15 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 21 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 28 2021Rescheduled.
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 11 2021Rescheduled.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 18 2021Rescheduled.
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 25 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 01 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 08 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 15 2021Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James David Thorburn
    Counsel of Record
Thorburn Law Group LLC
5460 South Quebec St
Suite 310
Greenwood Village, CO 80111

jthorburn@thorburnwalker.com
(303) 646-3482
Party name: Standing Akimbo, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543