SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-6419 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-6419 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Romell Broom, Petitioner
v.
Tim Shoop, Warden
Docketed:
November 24, 2020
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-3356)
Decision Date:
June 23, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 28, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 11 2020
Brief of respondent Tim Shoop in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 24 2020
Reply of petitioner Romell Broom filed.
Proof of Service
Main Document
Dec 30 2020
Suggestion of death of petitioner filed.
Proof of Service
Main Document
Mar 18 2021
Joint stipulation to dismiss the case pursuant Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shirley Adele Shank
Counsel of Record
Law Office of S. Adele Shank
3380 Tremont Road
Suite 270
Columbus, OH 432221
shanklaw@att.net
614 326-1217
Party name: Romell Broom
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Michael Flowers
Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215
benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Tim Shoop
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##