Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-6400
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-6400
Title:Kenneth Lamont Sanders, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1497)
   Decision Date:April 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 17 2020Response Requested. (Due January 19, 2021)
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 18, 2021.
Feb 18 2021Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Caniglia v. Strom, 593 U. S. ___ (2021). Justice Kavanaugh, concurring in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand. (Detached Opinion)
Jul 06 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nova Danielle Janssen
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Northern & Southern Districts of Iowa
400 Locust Street, Suite 340
Des Moines, IA 50309

nova_janssen@fd.org
5153099610
Party name: Kenneth Sanders
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543