Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-639
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-639
Title:Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley, Petitioner
v.
Steve Sisolak, Governor of Nevada, et al.
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-16169)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2020Amicus brief of Religious Organizations not accepted for filing. (December 10, 2020) (Corrected brief filed)
Dec 10 2020Response to petition from respondent Frank Hunewill filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Islam And Religious Freedom Action Team and Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 10 2020Brief amici curiae of the Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission, National Association of Evangelicals, and the Lutheran Church—Missouri Synod filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Religious Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Reply of petitioner Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021The respondents are directed to file a response to the petition on or before noon, Tuesday, January 19, 2021. Petitioner may file a reply brief on or before noon, Thursday, January 21, 2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 19 2021Brief of respondents Steve Sisolak, in his official capacity as Governor of Nevada, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 21 2021Reply of petitioner Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Andrew Cortman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, NE
Suite D-1100
Lawrenceville, GA 30043

dcortman@adflegal.org
7703390774
Party name: Calvary Chapel Dayton Valley
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Richard Hardy
    Counsel of Record
Marquis Aurbach Coffing
10001 Park Run Drive
Las Vegas, NV 89145

bhardy@maclaw.com
702-382-0711
Party name: Frank Hunewill
Heidi Jill Parry Stern
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Nevada Attorney General
555 E. Washington Ave., Suite 3900
Las Vegas, NV 89101

hstern@ag.nv.gov
702-486-3594
Party name: Steve Sisolak, in his official capacity as Governor of Nevada, and Aaron Ford, in his official capacity as the Nevada Attorney General
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
2 West Washington Street
Suite 400
Greenville, SC 29601

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
8643732352
Party name: the Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission, National Association of Evangelicals, and the Lutheran Church—Missouri Synod
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: Islam And Religious Freedom Action Team and Jewish Coalition For Religious Liberty
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Office of the Attorney General
700 Capitol Avenue, Room 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, et al.
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Religious Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543