Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-622
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-622
Title:Amazon.com, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Bernadean Rittmann, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35381)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2021.
Dec 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Civil Justice Association of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2021Brief of Bernadean Rittmann in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from January 27, 2021 to February 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2021Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until February 3, 2021 granted.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Amazon.com, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Shannon Liss-Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston Street
Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

sliss@llrlaw.com
6179945800
Party name: Bernadean Rittmann
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Allied Educational Foundation
Fred J. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation
3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1
Sacramento, CA 95817

fred@fjh-law.com
9164485100
Party name: Civil Justice Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543