Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-62
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-62
Title:Parents for Privacy, et al., Petitioners
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:July 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35708)
   Decision Date:February 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2020Motion of Basic Rights Oregon, et al. to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2020 to October 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2020, for all respondents.
Oct 23 2020Memorandum of Federal Respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2020Brief of respondent Dallas School District No. 2 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2020Brief of respondent Basic Rights Oregon in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2020Reply of petitioners Parents for Privacy, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mary Elizabeth McAlister
    Counsel of Record
Child & Parental Rights Campaign, Inc.
P.O. Box 637
Monroe, VA 24574

mmcalister@childparentrights.org
770 448 4525
Party name: Parents for Privacy, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James D. Esseks
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

jesseks@aclu.org
212-549-2623
Party name: Basic Rights Oregon
Blake Henrie Fry
    Counsel of Record
Mersereau Shannon LLP
111 SW Columbia Street, Suite 1100
Portland, OR 97201

bfry@mershanlaw.com
(503) 226-64000
Party name: Dallas School District No. 2
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, Williams, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543