Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-6199
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-6199
Title:Jacob Townley Hernandez, Petitioner
v.
Suzanne M. Peery, Warden
Docketed:November 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16082)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 3, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 05 2021Response Requested. (Due February 4, 2021)
Jan 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2021 to March 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 8, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Mar 08 2021Brief of respondent Suzanne M. Peery, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2021Reply of petitioner Jacob Townley Hernandez filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 12 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 21 2021Rescheduled.
Apr 26 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/30/2021.
Apr 27 2021Rescheduled.
May 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 10 2021Rescheduled.
May 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021.
May 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
Jun 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc Jonathan Zilversmit
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Marc J. Zilversmit
28 Boardman Place
San Francisco, CA 94103

marc@zdefender.com
415-431-3474
Party name: Jacob Townley Hernandez
Attorneys for Respondent
Jill M. Thayer
    Counsel of Record
California Attorney General's Office
455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

jill.thayer@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3868
Party name: Suzanne M. Peery, Warden
Bridget BilleterCalifornia Attorney General's Office
455 Golden Gate Avenue
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

bridget.billeter@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3763
Party name: Suzanne M. Peery, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543