Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-6046
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-6046
Title:Eric Gerard McGinnis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-10197)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 16, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2020 to December 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2020.
Dec 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2020 to January 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 15, 2021.
Jan 15 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 15 2021Reply of petitioner Eric McGinnis submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brandon Elliott Beck
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office, Northern District of Texas
1205 Texas Ave. #507
Lubbock, TX 79401

brandonebeck@gmail.com
806-472-7236
Party name: Eric McGinnis
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543