Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-602
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-602
Title:Stephanie Clifford, aka Stormy Daniels, Petitioner
v.
Donald J. Trump
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-56351)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Waiver of right of respondent Donald J. Trump to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 10 2020Response Requested. (Due January 11, 2021)
Jan 11 2021Brief of respondent Donald J. Trump in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Reply of petitioner Stephanie Clifford filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Clark Otto Brewster
    Counsel of Record
Brewster & De Angelis
2617 E. 21st St
Tulsa, OK 74114

cbrewster@brewsterlaw.com
9187422021
Party name: Stephanie Clifford
Mbilike Mackintosh MwafulirwaBrewster & De Angelis
2617 E. 21st Street
Tulsa, OK 74114

mmm@brewsterlaw.com
918-742-2021
Party name: Stephanie Clifford
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles John Harder
    Counsel of Record
HARDER, LLP
132 South Rodeo Drive, Fourth Floor
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

CHarder@HarderLLP.com
424.203.1600
Party name: Donald J. Trump

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543