Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-601
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-601
Title:Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky, Petitioner
v.
EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5516)
   Decision Date:June 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2020 to February 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2021.
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of The States of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2021Brief of respondents EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2021Reply of petitioner Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Apr 06 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 14, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 13, 2021.
Jun 14 2021Brief of petitioner Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Jun 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Philip E. Berger, President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October 12, 2021.
Jul 28 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Jul 28 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit has been electronically filed.
Aug 03 2021CIRCULATED
Aug 13 2021Brief of respondents EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Reply of petitioner Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Argued. For petitioner: Matthew F. Kuhn, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Frankfort, Ky. For respondents: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas, New York, N. Y.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Franklin Kuhn
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General of Kentucky
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

matt.kuhn@ky.gov
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky
Barry Lee DunnOffice of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue
Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

barry.dunn@ky.gov
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky
Attorneys for Respondents
Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Federation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

akolbi-molinas@aclu.org
2125197845
Party name: EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al.
Andrew David BeckAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

abeck@aclu.org
212-549-2633
Party name: EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al.
Other
Adam Scott Gershenson
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
500 Boylston Street, 14th Floor
Boston, MA 02116

agershenson@cooley.com
617-937-2300
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Brunn Wall Roysden III
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 North Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

beau.roysden@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: The States of Arizona, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Philip E. Berger, President Pro Tempore of the North Carolina Senate, and Timothy K. Moore, Speaker of the North Carolina House of Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543