Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5941 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5941 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Charles Victor Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:October 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-70008)
   Decision Date:October 29, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:May 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 6, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2020 to December 7, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2020.
Dec 07 2020Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the case under Rule 15.5 from December 23, 2020 to January 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until January 7, 2021 granted. (Docket entry corrected 12/23/20 to reflect correct distribution date)
Jan 05 2021Reply of petitioner Charles Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 19 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 16 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 25 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 03 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan, with whom Justice Breyer and Justice Sotomayor join, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan David Landers
    Counsel of Record
Jonathan Landers, Attorney at Law
917 Franklin, Suite 300
Houston, TX 77002

jlanders.law@gmail.com
713-685-5000
Party name: Charles Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543