Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5904
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5904
Title:Tarahrick Terry, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10482)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020.
Dec 04 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5. filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Reply of petitioner Tarahrick Terry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 08 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Jan 28 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Tarahrick Terry.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 28 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Tarahrick Terry
Blanket Consent
Feb 12 2021Brief of petitioner Tarahrick Terry filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amici curiae of American Conservative Union & ACU Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Senators Richard J. Durbin, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Retired Federal Judges, Former Federal Prosecutors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2021Brief amici curiae of ACLU, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 20, 2021.
Mar 15 2021Letter of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 15 2021Letter of petitioner Tarahrick Terry filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 15 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 17 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Florida is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 19 2021The case is removed from the calendar for the March 2021 argument session. Adam K. Mortara, Esquire, of Chicago, Illinois, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below. The case will be rescheduled for argument this Term.
Mar 25 2021The brief of the Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below, and any other briefs of amicus curiae in support, are to be filed on or before Tuesday, April 13, 2021. Any reply brief is to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 2 p.m., Wednesday, April 28, 2021. The case is set for oral argument on Tuesday, May 4, 2021.
Mar 25 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, May 4, 2021.
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Motion for leave to file a brief out of time filed by respondent.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondent in support of reversal.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 05 2021Motion of respondent for leave to file a brief out of time GRANTED.
Apr 05 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondent GRANTED.
Apr 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Reply of petitioner Tarahrick Terry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 28 2021Reply of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2021Argued. For petitioner: Andrew L. Adler, Ft. Lauderdale, Fla. For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below: Adam K. Mortara, Chicago, Ill.
Jun 14 2021Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Alito, Kagan, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

andrew_adler@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Tarahrick Terry
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Adam K. Mortara
    Counsel of Record
125 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60606

adam@mortaralaw.com
773-750-7154
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
Loren L. AliKhan
    Counsel of Record
D.C. Office of the Attorney General
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

loren.alikhan@dc.gov
202-727-6287
Party name: District of Columbia, on behalf of itself and 18 states
Gerard Justin Cedrone
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

gcedrone@goodwinlaw.com
617-570-1849
Party name: Retired Federal Judges, Former Federal Prosecutors, and the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, The ACLU of Florida, the NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., and the R Street Institute
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-637-6379
Party name: Senators Richard J. Durbin, Charles E. Grassley, Cory A. Booker, and Mike Lee
Joshua Christopher Toll
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jtoll@kslaw.com
(202) 737-8616
Party name: American Conservative Union & ACU Foundation, Cato Institute, Lincoln Network, Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543