Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-579
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-579
Title:Zimmian Tabb, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-338)
   Decision Date:February 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 16 2020Response Requested. (Due December 16, 2020)
Dec 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2020 to January 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 15, 2021.
Dec 16 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders and American Farm Bureau Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2020Brief amici curiae of The New Civil Liberties Alliance & the Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 15, 2021 to February 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2021. See Rule 30.1.
Feb 16 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2021Reply of petitioner Zimmian Tabb filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 03 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Zimmian Tabb filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 17 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 01 2021Second supplemental brief of petitioner Zimmian Tabb filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Zimmian Tabb
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Jared Alan McClain
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

jared.mcclain@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
8563050034
Party name: The New Civil Liberties Alliance & the Due Process Institute
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
5123222506
Party name: National Association of Home Builders and American Farm Bureau Federation
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543