Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5715
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5715
Title:Martin Rogelio Longoria, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 16, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20201)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 16, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Sep 21 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 05 2020Response Requested. (Due November 4, 2020)
Nov 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020.
Nov 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2020 to February 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2021.
Jan 29 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 10 2021Reply of petitioner Martin Longoria filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Gorsuch joins, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Andrew Martin
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002

scott_martin@fd.org
713-7184600
Party name: Martin Longoria
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543