Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-569
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-569
Title:Elim Romanian Pentecostal Church, et al., Petitioners
v.
J. B. Pritzker, Governor of Illinois
Docketed:October 30, 2020
Linked with 20A147
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1811)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 27, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2020Waiver of right of respondent Jay Robert Pritzker to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Nov 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2020Response Requested. (Due December 30, 2020)
Nov 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 30, 2020 to January 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2021.
Jan 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 29, 2021 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 14 2021Response to motion for an extension of time from petitioner filed.
Main Document
Jan 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including February 16, 2021.
Feb 16 2021Brief of respondent Jay Robert Pritzker in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2021Leave to Exceed Word Limit in Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Elim Romanian Pentecostal Church not accepted for filing. (March 08, 2021)
Feb 26 2021Reply of Elim Romanian Pentecostal Church not accepted for filing. (March 09, 2021)
Mar 01 2021Application (20A147) to file reply brief in excess of word limits, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 08 2021Application (20A147) denied by The Chief Justice.
Mar 08 2021Supplemental brief of respondent Jay Robert Pritzker filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2021Reply of petitioner Elim Romanian Pentecostal Church filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021Petition DENIED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Elim Romanian Pentecostal Church
Attorneys for Respondent
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: Jay Robert Pritzker
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission et al
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Constitutional Rights Union
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 S. LaSalle St., Suire 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
4145881658
Party name: Liberty Justice Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543