Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5659
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5659
Title:Gabriel M. Robles, Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:September 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1460)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 13, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 28 2020Waiver of right of respondent Wilkie, Robert to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8.
Nov 03 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gabriel M. Robles1243 SW Western Ave.
Apt. B-18
Topeka, KS 66604

(785) 224-8195
Party name: Gabriel M. Robles
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilkie, Robert

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543