Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-559
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-559
Title:Jane Doe, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-185)
   Decision Date:May 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts and Constitutional Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center and The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Protect Our Defenders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief amici curiae of Graduates of U.S. Service Academies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2020Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program and Paralyzed Veterans of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 07 2020Response Requested. (Due January 6, 2021)
Dec 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2021 to February 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2021.
Feb 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2021 to March 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 8, 2021.
Mar 08 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2021Reply of petitioner Jane Doe filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael J. Wishnie
    Counsel of Record
Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization
P.O. Box 209090
New Haven, CT 06520-9090

michael.wishnie@yale.edu
203-436-4780
Party name: Jane Doe
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program and Paralyzed Veterans of America
Maya M. Eckstein
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 East Byrd Street
Richmond, VA 23219

meckstein@hunton.com
804-788-8788
Party name: Protect Our Defenders, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center and The Rutherford Institute
Brian Robert Matsui
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bmatsui@mofo.com
202-887-8784
Party name: Graduates of U.S. Service Academies
Rasha Gerges Shields
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
555 South Flower Street, 50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

rgergesshields@jonesday.com
(213) 243-2719
Party name: Federal Courts and Constitutional Law Professors

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543