Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5581
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5581
Title:Tatyana E. Drevaleva, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1671)
   Decision Date:May 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 5, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam).
Oct 24 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 10 2020Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tatyana E. Drevaleva3015 Clement St., Apt. 204
San Francisco, CA 94121

(415) 806-9864
Party name: Tayana E. Drevaleva
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543