Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5579
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5579
Title:Israel Torres, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 2, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10076)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 3, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 2, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 2, 2020 to November 2, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2020.
Oct 01 2020Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2020 to November 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 6, 2020.
Nov 06 2020Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Reply of Israel Torres submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Lee Kaplan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
850 West Adams Street, Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

dan_kaplan@fd.org
6023822767
Party name: Israel Torres
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

josephgreenlee@gmail.com
(970) 485-3303
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Madison Society Foundation, and Second Amendment Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543