Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-553
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-553
Title:Pennsylvania Voters Alliance, et al., Petitioners
v.
Centre County, Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:October 28, 2020
Linked with 20A82
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3175)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due November 27, 2020)
Petition
Nov 02 2020Application (20A82) for injunctive relief pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Nov 03 2020Application (20A82) denied by Justice Alito.
Nov 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent City of Philadelphia to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Waiver of right of respondent Centre County to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 27 2020Waiver of right of respondents Kathy Boockvar, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 27 2020Letter of November 23, 2020 from counsel for petitioners with notice of an order from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Dec 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erick G. Kaardal
    Counsel of Record
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson P.A.
150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3100
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kaardal@mklaw.com
612-465-0927
Party name: Pennsylvania Voters Alliance, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jerry Robert DeSiderato
    Counsel of Record
Dilworth Paxson LLP
1500 Market St., Suite 3500E
Philadelphia, PA 19102

jdesiderato@dilworthlaw.com
215-575-7290
Party name: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Molly Elizabeth Meacham
    Counsel of Record
Babst Calland Clements and Zomnir, PC
Two Gateway Center, 603 Stanwix Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

mmeacham@babstcalland.com
4126008528
Party name: Centre County
Robert Andrew Wiygul
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rwiygul@hangley.com
215-496-7042
Party name: Kathy Boockvar, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543