Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5519
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5519
Title:Richard Wanke, Petitioner
v.
Illinois
Docketed:August 26, 2020
Lower Ct:Appellate Court of Illinois, Second District
   Case Numbers:(2-17-0373)
   Decision Date:November 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 25, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 25, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 10 2020Waiver of right of respondent Illinois to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard E. WankeK77902
P.O. Box 1000
Menard, IL 62259

Party name: Richard Wanke
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Marc Glick
    Counsel of Record
Illinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

mglick@atg.state.il.us
3128142232
Party name: Illinois

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543