Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-550
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-550
Title:Heon Jong Yoo, aka Hank Yoo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-40465)
   Decision Date:June 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2020)
Petition
Nov 05 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
L. Charles Van Cleef
    Counsel of Record
Van Cleef Law Office
P.O. Box 2432
Longview, TX 75606-2432

charles@vancleef.pro
9032488244
Party name: Heon Jong Yoo
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543