Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-54
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-54
Title:Bridge Aina Le'a, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Hawaii Land Use Commission
Docketed:July 22, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15738, 18-15817)
   Decision Date:February 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2020Waiver of right of respondent Hawaii Land Use Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Four Takings Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Amicus brief of Owners' Counsel of America, National Association of Reversionary Property Owners, NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Reason Foundation, and Professor Shelley Ross Saxer submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2020Amicus brief of Matteoni, O'Laughlin & Hechtman submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Hawaii Land Use Commission
Blanket Consent
Sep 24 2020Response Requested. (Due October 26, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angeles, CA 90067

mmberger@manatt.com
(310) 312-4185
Party name: Bridge Aina Le'a, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Ewan Christopher Rayner
    Counsel of Record
Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii
425 Queen Street
Honolulu, HI 96813

ewan.rayner@hawaii.gov
(808) 586-1360
Party name: Hawaii Land Use Commission
Kimberly Tsumoto GuidryDepartment of the Attorney General, State of HI
425 Queen St.
Honolulu, HI 96813

kimberly.t.guidry@hawaii.gov
(808) 586-1360
Party name: Hawaii Land Use Commission
Other
Mark Fernlund Hearne II
    Counsel of Record
True North Law, LLC
112 S. Hanley Road
Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63105

thor@truenorthlawgroup.com
3142964000
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America, National Association of Reversionary Property Owners, NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Reason Foundation, and Professor Shelley Ross Saxer
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

bth@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
Devala Anant Janardan
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

devala79@gmail.com
7039459479
Party name: National Association of Home Builders, et al.
Norman E. Matteoni
    Counsel of Record
Matteoni, O'Laughlin & Hechtman
848 The Alameda
San Jose, CA 95126

norm@matteoni.com
4082834300
Party name: Matteoni, O'Laughlin & Hechtman
Dwight H. Merriam
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
80 Latimer Lane
Weatogue, CT 06089

dwightmerriam@gmail.com
8604637233
Party name: Four Takings Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543