Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-539
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-539
Vide 20-429, 20-454
Title:Oregon, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:October 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15974, 19-35386)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2020.
Dec 04 2020Brief for the Federal Respondents filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Reply of petitioners Oregon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 20-429 and 20-454 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Feb 22 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-429. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-429. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 12 2021Joint stipulation to dismiss the cases in Nos. 20-429 and 20-539 pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed. VIDED.
May 17 2021The Government has filed a letter brief representing that it will continue enforcing the challenged rule and regulations outside the State of Maryland for as long as they remain operative. If further litigation is brought against the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland, the Government represents that it will either oppose that litigation on threshold grounds or seek to hold the litigation in abeyance pending the completion of notice and comment. In light of the Government’s representations, the motions for leave to intervene are denied, and the petitions in Nos. 20-429, 20-454, and 20-539 are dismissed pursuant to Rule 46.1. If the Government fails to enforce the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland prior to the completion of notice and comment, or if litigation is brought against the challenged rule and regulations outside of Maryland, any aggrieved party may file an application in this Court after seeking relief in the appropriate District Court and Court of Appeals. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would grant the motions for leave to intervene and deny the stipulations to dismiss the petitions.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Oregon, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543