Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-536
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-536
Vide 20-534
Title:The Episcopal Church, et al., Petitioners
v.
The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
Docketed:October 22, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(18-0438)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2020.
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amici curiae of General Assembly of the Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.), et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020Brief of respondents The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Jan 06 2021Reply of petitioners The Episcopal Church, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: The Episcopal Church, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: The Episcopal Diocese of Fort Worth, et al.
Other
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: General Assembly of the Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.), et al.
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543