Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5279
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5279
Title:William Dale Wooden, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5189)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 4, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Aug 12 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 22 2020Response Requested. (Due October 22, 2020)
Oct 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2020 to November 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2020.
Nov 09 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 23, 2020.
Dec 21 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 06 2021Reply of petitioner William Dale Wooden filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis GRANTED. Petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition.
Mar 05 2021Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 22 2021Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 3, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 28, 2021.
May 03 2021Brief of petitioner William Dale Wooden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors of Criminal Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2021Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights For Kids filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 28 2021Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 13 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, October 4, 2021.
Jul 28 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Jul 28 2021Reply of petitioner William Dale Wooden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021Record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit has been electronically filed.
Aug 03 2021CIRCULATED
Oct 04 2021Argued. For petitioner: Allon Kedem, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Erica L. Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029426234
Party name: William Dale Wooden
William Dale Wooden48306-074
P.O. Box 9000
Forrest City, AR 72336

Party name: William Dale Wooden
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Donald Burke
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP
2000 K St NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

dburke@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4491
Party name: Professors of Criminal Law
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Devi Maheswari Rao
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
501 H Street NE, Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

devi.rao@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
Gregory Gerber Rapawy
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

grapawy@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7967
Party name: FAMM
Peter Bert Siegal
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

peter.siegal@nortonrosefulbright.com
(202) 662-4663
Party name: National Association Of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Tony William Torain II
    Counsel of Record
Polsinelli P.C.
1401 I Street, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

twtorain@polsinelli.com
2027833300
Party name: Human Rights For Kids

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543