Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-527
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-527
Title:Kevin Guskiewicz, in His Official Capacity as Chancellor of the University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, et al., Petitioners
v.
DTH Media Corporation, et al.
Docketed:October 20, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(142PA18)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Victim Advocacy Groups.
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2020Brief of respondents DTH Media Corporation, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 24 2020Response to motion from respondents DTH Media Corporation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 27 2020Rule 29.6 Statement filed with respect to the brief in opposition of respondents DTH Media Corporation, et al..
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 11 2020Reply of petitioners Kevin Guskiewicz, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Victim Advocacy Groups GRANTED.
Jan 11 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sarah Gardner Boyce
    Counsel of Record
NC Department of Justice
Post Office Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

sboyce@ncdoj.gov
9197166400
Party name: Kevin Guskiewicz, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
H. Hugh Stevens Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Stevens Martin Vaughn & Tadych, PLLC
1101 Haynes Street
Suite 100
Raleligh, NC 27604

hugh@smvt.com
9195822300
Party name: DTH Media Corporation, et al.
Other
Kip David Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
434 Fayetteville Street
Suite 2800
Raleigh, NC 27601

knelson@foxrothschild.com
919.755.8700
Party name: Victim Advocacy Groups

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543