Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-525
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-525
Title:Harold E. Rutila, IV, Petitioner
v.
Department of Transportation
Docketed:October 20, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1712)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2020)
AppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountPetition
Nov 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Department of Transportation to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Harold E. Rutila IV114 W. Adams Ave.
Apt. 401
Detroit, MI 48226

(810) 845-3497
Party name: Harold E. Rutila
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Transportation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543