Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-5214
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-5214
Title:Ricardo A. Haynes, Petitioner
v.
Robert Wilkie, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:July 30, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1535)
   Decision Date:October 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 31, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Aug 06 2020Waiver of right of respondent Wilkie, Sec. of VA to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Oct 05 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ricardo A. Haynes1201 Oak Lane
#A105
Washington, DC 20013

202-520-6681
Party name: Ricardo A. Haynes
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilkie, Sec. of VA

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543