Docket for 20-520
|
Oct 15 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 09 2020 | Brief of respondents Shawne Alston, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 13 2020 | Brief amicus curiae of Sam C. Ehrlich filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 18 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law And Business School Professors filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 18 2020 | Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Economists filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 24 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020. | | | Nov 24 2020 | Reply of petitioner The Big Ten Conference, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 16 2020 | Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-512 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED. | | | Dec 16 2020 | Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-512. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-512. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” | | | Feb 01 2021 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 31, 2021. VIDED. | | | Feb 04 2021 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. | | | Feb 04 2021 | Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer. Part of the record is SEALED and has been electronically filed. | | | Feb 22 2021 | CIRCULATED. | | | Mar 31 2021 | Argued. For petitioners: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Jeffrey L. Kessler, New York, N. Y.; and Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Acting Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) VIDED. | | | Jun 21 2021 | Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. Kavanaugh, J., filed a concurring opinion. VIDED. | | | Jul 23 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|